+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 7, 2005 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ506ER)
On February 25, 2005 in the House:
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
On February 18, 2005 in the House:
- Laid on Speaker's table
- Received
On February 17, 2005 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Engrossed by Senate
On February 14, 2005 in the Senate:
- Introduced bill reprinted 058564796
On February 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Presented 058564796
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor