+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 8, 1999 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ502ER)
On February 16, 1999 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from Science and Technology (22-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Science and Technology
- Placed on Calendar
On February 8, 1999 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 999610635-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 999610635-S1
- Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived
- Agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 5, 1999 in the Senate:
- Read first time
- Committee substitute printed 999610635-S1
On February 4, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with substitute (17-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 1999 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On January 21, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed 999914635
+ − Votes (5)
February 16, 1999: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 12, 1999: Reported from Science and Technology (22-Y 0-N)
February 8, 1999: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
February 8, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1999: Reported from Finance with substitute (17-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor