+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 24, 2005 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ495ER)
On February 18, 2005 in the House:
- Agreed to by House
On February 11, 2005 in the House:
- Laid on Speaker's table
- Received
On February 10, 2005 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Agreed to by Senate
- Engrossed by Senate
On February 9, 2005 in the Senate:
- Introduced bill reprinted 058531740
On February 8, 2005 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Presented 058531740