+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ489ER)
On February 25, 2011 in the House:
- Agreed to by House
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Laid on Speaker's table
- Received
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate
- Engrossed by Senate
On February 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Introduced bill reprinted 11105261D
On February 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Presented 11105261D
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor