+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 23, 2001 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ488ER)
On February 21, 2001 in the House:
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
On February 16, 2001 in the House:
- Laid on Speaker's table
- Placed on Calendar
On February 15, 2001 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Printed as engrossed 017524408-E
- Engrossed by Senate
- Taken up
On February 12, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On February 8, 2001 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Rules suspended (38-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2001 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Presented 017524408
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor