+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 23, 1999 in the Senate:
- Substitute bill reprinted 991422760-S1
On March 11, 1999 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ487ER)
On February 25, 1999 in the Senate:
- House substitute agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Reading of substitute waived
On February 25, 1999 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 1-N)
- Agreed to by House with substitute (Block Vote) (99-Y 1-N)
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 991443753-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 991443753-H1
On February 24, 1999 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 23, 1999 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 991443753-H1
On February 22, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from Rules with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 12, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 9, 1999 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - fl. sub. 991422760-S1 (Woods)
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Substitute by Sen. Forbes agreed to 991422760
- Floor substitute printed 991422760-S1 (Forbes)
- Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Communicated to House
On February 8, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On January 21, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed 993365753
+ − Votes (4)
February 25, 1999: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 1-N)
February 22, 1999: Reported from Rules with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
February 9, 1999: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 8, 1999: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor