+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 5, 1996 in the House:
- No action taken by Rules by voice vote
On February 19, 1996 in the House:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: 3
On February 15, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 14, 1996 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 13, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 964488649-ES1
- Reading of amendment waived
- Amendment by Mr. Earley agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. w/amd. 964488649-ES1
- Printed as engrossed 964488649-ES1
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Communicated to House
On February 12, 1996 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 964488649-S1
- Reported from Rules with substitute
On January 19, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed 960356649