+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 3, 2010 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ48ER)
On January 29, 2010 in the House:
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
On January 22, 2010 in the House:
- Laid on Speaker's table
- Received
On January 21, 2010 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Engrossed by Senate
On January 20, 2010 in the Senate:
- Introduced bill reprinted 10102416D
On January 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and laid on Clerk's desk; offered 01/13/10 10102416D
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor