+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ474ER)
On February 16, 2007 in the House:
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
On February 12, 2007 in the House:
- Laid on Speaker's table
- Received
On February 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Engrossed by Senate
On February 6, 2007 in the Senate:
- Introduced bill reprinted 076682702
On February 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Presented 076682702