+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ47ER)
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N)
- Taken up
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Rules sub: Subcommittee #2
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Placed on Calendar
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100470D
+ − Votes (5)
March 6, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2018: Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N)
February 27, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2018: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2018: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor