+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 9, 2000 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ47ER)
On February 4, 2000 in the House:
- Agreed to by House
On January 28, 2000 in the House:
- Laid on Speaker's table
- Placed on Calendar
On January 27, 2000 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Agreed to by Senate
- Engrossed by Senate
- Taken up
On January 24, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On January 20, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Taken up
On January 12, 2000 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Presented 005092480
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor