+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 8, 2001 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ464ER)
On February 2, 2001 in the House:
- Agreed to by House
On January 26, 2001 in the House:
- Laid on Speaker's table
- Placed on Calendar
On January 25, 2001 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Agreed to by Senate
- Printed as engrossed 017713468-E
- Engrossed by Senate
- Taken up
On January 19, 2001 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Presented 017713468
+ − Sponsors (40)
Type:
Primary Sponsor