+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 21, 2005 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ464ER)
On February 11, 2005 in the House:
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
On February 4, 2005 in the House:
- Laid on Speaker's table
- Received
On February 3, 2005 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Engrossed by Senate
On January 31, 2005 in the Senate:
- Introduced bill reprinted 058406828
On January 26, 2005 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Presented 058406828