+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (56)
On April 12, 1999 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0934)
On March 30, 1999 in the House:
- Assigned Chapter 934 (effective 7/1/99)
On March 18, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 16, 1999 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ460ER)
- Signed by President
- Enrolled
On February 26, 1999 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On February 26, 1999 in the House:
- House insisted on substitute
- House requested conference committee
On February 26, 1999 in the Senate:
- Senate acceded to request (34-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ACCEDE CONFERENCE COMM. (34-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 1999 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Howell, Cantor, Councill
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 1-N)
On February 26, 1999 in the Senate:
- Senators: Newman, Bolling, Lambert
On February 26, 1999 in the House:
- Conference report agreed to by House (97-Y 1-N)
On February 26, 1999 in the Senate:
- House substitute rejected by conference committee
- Sub. recommended by conference comm. 997134719
- Reading of conference report waived
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (29-Y 4-N)
- VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT (29-Y 4-N)
- Conference substitute printed 997134719-S1
On February 25, 1999 in the House:
- Agreed to by House with substitute (96-Y 1-N)
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 991143719-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 991143719-H1
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 1-N)
On February 25, 1999 in the Senate:
- House substitute rejected by Senate (5-Y 33-N)
- VOTE: REJECT HOUSE SUBSTITUTE (5-Y 33-N)
- Reading of substitute waived
On February 24, 1999 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 23, 1999 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 991143719-H1
On February 22, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from Rules with substitute (11-Y 2-N)
On February 15, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 12, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 9, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES (40-Y 0-N)
- Read second time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Amendment by Sen. Gartlan agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Printed as engrossed 997108719-E
- Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by Senate (29-Y 9-N)
- Reading waived
- VOTE: AGREE TO (29-Y 9-N)
- Rec. of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (39-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by Senate (30-Y 9-N)
- VOTE: AGREE TO (30-Y 9-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 8, 1999 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 5, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reading waived
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (38-Y 0-N)
- Rules suspended (38-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented & ordered printed 997108719
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (12)
February 26, 1999: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 1-N)
February 26, 1999: VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT (29-Y 4-N)
February 26, 1999: VOTE: ACCEDE CONFERENCE COMM. (34-Y 0-N)
February 25, 1999: VOTE: REJECT HOUSE SUBSTITUTE (5-Y 33-N)
February 25, 1999: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 1-N)
February 22, 1999: Reported from Rules with substitute (11-Y 2-N)
February 9, 1999: VOTE: AGREE TO (29-Y 9-N)
February 9, 1999: VOTE: RECONSIDER (39-Y 0-N)
February 9, 1999: VOTE: AGREE TO (30-Y 9-N)
February 9, 1999: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES (40-Y 0-N)
February 5, 1999: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (38-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1999: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor