+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 11, 1999 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ455ER)
On February 5, 1999 in the House:
- Agreed to by House
On February 1, 1999 in the House:
- Laid on Speaker's table
On January 29, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On January 28, 1999 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Agreed to by Senate
- Engrossed by Senate
- Taken up
On January 21, 1999 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Presented 996136693
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor