+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 4, 2005 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ451ER)
On February 24, 2005 in the House:
- Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- Taken up
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2005 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 22, 2005 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 21, 2005 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 18, 2005 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 16, 2005 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Placed on Calendar
On February 8, 2005 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SJ451E
- Read second time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- VOTE: WAIVE READING R (38-Y 0-N)
- Printed as engrossed 055281772-E
- Reading waived (38-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Communicated to House
On February 7, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: WAIVE READING R (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendments by voice vote
On January 24, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed 055281772
- Unanimous consent to introduce
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 24, 2005: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2005: Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2005: VOTE: WAIVE READING R (38-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2005: VOTE: WAIVE READING R (40-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor