+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 18, 1999 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SR44ER)
On February 9, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: AGREE TO (38-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES (39-Y 0-N)
- Rules suspended (39-Y 0-N)
- Printed as engrossed 993191757-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
On February 8, 1999 in the Senate:
- Read first time
On February 7, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendments (16-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed 993191757
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
February 9, 1999: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES (39-Y 0-N)
February 9, 1999: VOTE: AGREE TO (38-Y 0-N)
February 7, 1999: Reported from Rules with amendments (16-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor