+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ44ER)
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
- Taken up
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Placed on Calendar
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
- Printed as engrossed 18100161D-E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SJ44E
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (13-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100161D
+ − Votes (5)
February 6, 2018: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2018: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2018: Read third time and agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2018: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2018: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor