+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 14, 2005 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ436ER)
On February 4, 2005 in the House:
- Agreed to by House
On January 28, 2005 in the House:
- Laid on Speaker's table
- Received
On January 27, 2005 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Agreed to by Senate
- Engrossed by Senate
On January 25, 2005 in the Senate:
- Introduced bill reprinted 058364796
On January 20, 2005 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Presented 058364796
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor