+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 14, 2005 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ426ER)
On February 4, 2005 in the House:
- Agreed to by House
On January 28, 2005 in the House:
- Laid on Speaker's table
- Received
On January 27, 2005 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Agreed to by Senate
- Engrossed by Senate
On January 19, 2005 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Presented 059303820
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor