+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ423ER)
On February 9, 2007 in the House:
- Agreed to by House
On February 2, 2007 in the House:
- Laid on Speaker's table
- Received
On February 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Agreed to by Senate
- Engrossed by Senate
- Introduced bill reprinted 078111724
On January 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Presented 078111724