+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ415ER)
On February 11, 2011 in the House:
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
On February 4, 2011 in the House:
- Laid on Speaker's table
- Received
On February 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Introduced bill reprinted 11104377D
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Engrossed by Senate
On February 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Presented 11104377D
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor