+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 8, 1999 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ412ER)
On February 25, 1999 in the House:
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (99-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 1-N)
On February 23, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from Militia and Police (20-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1999 in the House:
- Assigned to M. & P. sub-committee: 1
On February 15, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
On February 12, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 9, 1999 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Read second time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
- Printed as engrossed 996543829-E
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Communicated to House
On February 8, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendment by voice vote
On January 21, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed 996543829
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 25, 1999: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 1-N)
February 23, 1999: Reported from Militia and Police (20-Y 0-N)
February 9, 1999: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 8, 1999: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor