+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 8, 1999 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ406ER)
On February 15, 1999 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from Tra. (25-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
On February 6, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 4, 1999 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
- Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N)
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- VOTE: (39-Y 1-N)
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Communicated to House
On February 3, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On January 20, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed 994672758
+ − Votes (5)
February 15, 1999: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 11, 1999: Reported from Tra. (25-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1999: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1999: VOTE: (39-Y 1-N)
February 3, 1999: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor