+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 1, 1995 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ405ER)
On February 25, 1995 in the House:
- Agreed to by House (79-Y 19-N)
- Taken up
- Reported from Rules (10-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (79-Y 19-N)
On February 24, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 23, 1995 in the Senate:
- Taken up for immediate consideration
- Rules suspended (36-Y 2-N)
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES (36-Y 2-N)
- Discharged from Rules
- Engrossed by Senate
- Readings waived
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Communicated to House
On February 23, 1995 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 22, 1995 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed LD5495677
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Consent to introduce (40-Y 0-N)
+ − Votes (4)
February 25, 1995: Reported from Rules (10-Y 0-N)
February 25, 1995: VOTE: ADOPTION (79-Y 19-N)
February 23, 1995: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES (36-Y 2-N)
February 22, 1995: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor