+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 4, 2003 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ401ER)
On January 24, 2003 in the House:
- Agreed to by House
On January 17, 2003 in the House:
- Laid on Speaker's table
- Placed on Calendar
On January 16, 2003 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Agreed to by Senate
- Printed as engrossed 033680518-E
- Engrossed by Senate
- Taken up
On January 14, 2003 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Presented 033680518
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor