+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 15, 2002 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ4ER)
On January 25, 2002 in the House:
- Agreed to by House
On January 18, 2002 in the House:
- Laid on Speaker's table
- Placed on Calendar
On January 17, 2002 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Agreed to by Senate
- Printed as engrossed 020812420-E
- Engrossed by Senate
- Taken up
On January 9, 2002 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Presented 020812420
- Prefiled; 11/29/01