+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ394ER)
On February 13, 2003 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (79-Y 15-N)
- Agreed to by House (79-Y 15-N)
- Passed by temporarily
- Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
- VOTE: ADOPTION (61-Y 36-N)
- Agreed to by House (61-Y 36-N)
- Taken up
On February 11, 2003 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Placed on Calendar
On January 31, 2003 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On January 30, 2003 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute 035236436-S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 035236436-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 29, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2003 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 035236436-S1
On January 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with substitute by voice vote
On January 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed 031338436
+ − Votes (4)
February 13, 2003: VOTE: ADOPTION (61-Y 36-N)
February 13, 2003: VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (79-Y 15-N)
February 11, 2003: Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2003: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor