+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On February 19, 2001 in the House:
- Tabled in Rules (16-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Placed on Calendar
On February 6, 2001 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived
- Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 017950500-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute 017950500-S1
- Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Communicated to House
On February 5, 2001 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 017950500-S1
- Reported from Rules with substitute by voice vote
On January 10, 2001 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/10/01 019069500
+ − Votes (4)
February 19, 2001: Tabled in Rules (16-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2001: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2001: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2001: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor