+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 8, 1999 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ391ER)
On February 25, 1999 in the House:
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (99-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 1-N)
On February 24, 1999 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 22, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (24-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 1999 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On February 7, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On February 6, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 4, 1999 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 992245825-E
- Read second time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Title replaced
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Rec. of passage agreed to by Senate(39-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 1-N)
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Communicated to House
On February 3, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendments by voice vote
On January 20, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed 992245825
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 25, 1999: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 1-N)
February 22, 1999: Reported from Courts of Justice (24-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1999: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1999: VOTE: (39-Y 1-N)
February 3, 1999: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor