+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ390ER)
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N)
- Taken up
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N)
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Placed on Calendar
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate
- Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
- Read first time
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (11-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented and ordered printed 17105298D
+ − Votes (6)
February 21, 2017: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2017: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2017: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2017: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2017: Agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2017: Reported from Privileges and Elections (11-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor