+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 2, 2006 in the House:
- Stricken from docket by Rules by voice vote
On February 14, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Placed on Calendar
On February 8, 2006 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On February 7, 2006 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On January 10, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 061604702
+ − Vote
February 6, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor