+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 9, 1999 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ389ER)
On February 25, 1999 in the House:
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (99-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 1-N)
On February 24, 1999 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 22, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 1999 in the House:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: 3
On February 7, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 6, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 4, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 991408745-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 991408745-S1
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 1-N)
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Communicated to House
On February 3, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 1999 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 991408745-S1
- Reported from Rules with substitute by voice vote
On January 20, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed 996339745
+ − Votes (5)
February 25, 1999: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 1-N)
February 22, 1999: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1999: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1999: VOTE: (39-Y 1-N)
February 3, 1999: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor