+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ389ER)
On February 4, 2011 in the House:
- Agreed to by House
On January 28, 2011 in the House:
- Laid on Speaker's table
- Received
On January 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate
- Engrossed by Senate
On January 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Introduced bill reprinted 11103513D
On January 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Presented 11103513D
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor