+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 11, 1999 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ385ER)
On February 25, 1999 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 1-N)
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (99-Y 1-N)
On February 24, 1999 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 22, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (13-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 6, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 4, 1999 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
- Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N)
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- VOTE: (39-Y 1-N)
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Communicated to House
On February 3, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On January 20, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed 999852753
+ − Votes (5)
February 25, 1999: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 1-N)
February 22, 1999: Reported from Rules (13-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1999: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1999: VOTE: (39-Y 1-N)
February 3, 1999: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor