+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ379ER)
On February 20, 2009 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Taken up
On February 17, 2009 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Placed on Calendar
On February 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Read third time
On February 3, 2009 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On January 21, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented and ordered printed 098785220
+ − Votes (3)
February 20, 2009: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2009: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2009: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor