+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (37)
On April 4, 1995 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0710)
On April 3, 1995 in the House:
- Assigned Chapter 710 (effective 7/1/95)
On March 14, 1995 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 13, 1995 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 13, 1995 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ378ER)
On February 20, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (39-Y 0-N)
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Reading of amendments waived
On February 16, 1995 in the House:
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House with amendments (96-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 1995 in the House:
- Reported from Rules with amendments (10-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 8, 1995 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 7, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (39-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
- Rules suspended (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES (39-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived
- Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived
- Floor amendments rejected (Saslaw)
- Engrossed by Senate
- Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES (40-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by Senate (30-Y 9-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (30-Y 9-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 6, 1995 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 2, 1995 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 1, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reading waived
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES (40-Y 0-N)
- Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (9-Y 3-N)
On January 23, 1995 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented & ordered printed LD8485843
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (9)
February 20, 1995: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (39-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1995: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
February 14, 1995: Reported from Rules with amendments (10-Y 0-N)
February 7, 1995: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES (39-Y 0-N)
February 7, 1995: VOTE: RECONSIDER (39-Y 0-N)
February 7, 1995: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES (40-Y 0-N)
February 7, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE (30-Y 9-N)
February 1, 1995: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES (40-Y 0-N)
January 31, 1995: Reported from Privileges and Elections (9-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor