+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On February 28, 1997 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ377ER)
On February 20, 1997 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 1997 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 18, 1997 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (10-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 1, 1997 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On January 30, 1997 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Title replaced
- Printed as engrossed 978013378-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Communicated to House
On January 29, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendments by voice vote
On January 20, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed 978013378