+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ377ER)
On January 28, 2011 in the House:
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
On January 21, 2011 in the House:
- Laid on Speaker's table
- Received
On January 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Engrossed by Senate
- Taken up for immediate consideration
- Rules suspended (38-Y 0-N)
- Introduced bill reprinted 11101431D
On January 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Presented 11101431D
+ − Vote
January 20, 2011: Rules suspended (38-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor