+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 9, 2005 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ377ER)
On January 28, 2005 in the House:
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
On January 21, 2005 in the House:
- Laid on Speaker's table
- Received
On January 20, 2005 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Engrossed by Senate
- Introduced bill reprinted 051332740
On January 12, 2005 in the Senate:
- Prefiled & laid on Clerk's desk;offered 01/12/05 051332740