+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On February 4, 1997 in the Senate:
- Constitutional amendment needs 21 Yeas for passage
- Rejected by Senate (20-Y 18-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (40-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of defeat. action agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: REJECTED (19-Y 21-N)
- Rejected by Senate (19-Y 21-N)
- Read third time
- VOTE: REJECTED (20-Y 18-N)
On February 3, 1997 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 31, 1997 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 30, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
- Printed as engrossed 973814649-E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
On January 29, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from P. & E. with amendment (8-Y 3-N 3-A)
On January 20, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented & ordered printed 973814649
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 4, 1997: VOTE: REJECTED (19-Y 21-N)
February 4, 1997: VOTE: RECONSIDER (40-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1997: VOTE: REJECTED (20-Y 18-N)
January 29, 1997: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES (40-Y 0-N)
January 28, 1997: Reported from P. & E. with amendment (8-Y 3-N 3-A)
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor