+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 8, 1999 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ366ER)
On February 25, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute waived
- House substitute agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On February 23, 1999 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House with substitute (92-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 994364728-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 994364728-H1
On February 19, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from C. J. with substitute (24-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 994364728-H1
On February 15, 1999 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 3
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On February 12, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 9, 1999 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute agreed to 991418728-S1
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 991418728-S1
- Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 8, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 1999 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 991418728-S1
- Reported from Rules with substitute by voice vote
On January 19, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed 991803728
+ − Votes (4)
February 23, 1999: VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 0-N)
February 19, 1999: Reported from C. J. with substitute (24-Y 0-N)
February 9, 1999: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 8, 1999: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor