+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 28, 2009 in the House:
- Left in Rules
On February 19, 2009 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely by voice vote
On February 16, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned Rules sub: Studies
On February 11, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Placed on Calendar
On February 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 097323328-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SJ360S1
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On February 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 097323328-S1
- Reported from Rules with substitute by voice vote
On January 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned Rules sub: Studies
On January 14, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/09 091664328
+ − Votes (2)
February 10, 2009: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2009: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor