+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 12, 2008 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ36ER)
On January 25, 2008 in the House:
- Agreed to by House
On January 18, 2008 in the House:
- Laid on Speaker's table
- Received
On January 17, 2008 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Agreed to by Senate
- Engrossed by Senate
- Introduced bill reprinted 076493228
On January 7, 2008 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and laid on Clerk's desk; offered 01/09/08 076493228
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor