+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 17, 2009 in the House:
- Tabled in Rules (11-Y 4-N)
On February 11, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Placed on Calendar
On February 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SJ353S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 094215273-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On February 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 094215273-S1
- Reported from Rules with substitute by voice vote
On January 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned Rules sub: Studies
On January 14, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/09 092830273
+ − Votes (3)
February 17, 2009: Tabled in Rules (11-Y 4-N)
February 10, 2009: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2009: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor