+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 8, 2001 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ350ER)
On January 26, 2001 in the House:
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
On January 23, 2001 in the House:
- Laid on Speaker's table
- Placed on Calendar
On January 19, 2001 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Printed as engrossed 017625456-E
- Engrossed by Senate
- Taken up
- Rules suspended (39-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2001 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Presented 017625456
- Prefiled; 01/08/01
+ − Sponsors (54)
Type:
Primary Sponsor