+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 5, 2007 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ346ER)
On February 2, 2007 in the House:
- Agreed to by House
On January 26, 2007 in the House:
- Laid on Speaker's table
- Received
On January 25, 2007 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Agreed to by Senate
- Engrossed by Senate
On January 24, 2007 in the Senate:
- Introduced bill reprinted 078302808
On January 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and laid on Clerk's desk; offered 01/10/07 078302808
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor