+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 3, 1997 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ339ER)
On February 11, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendment waived
- House amendment agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On February 7, 1997 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House with amendment (Block Vote) (95-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
On February 5, 1997 in the House:
- Reported from Cons. & Nat. Res. w/amd. (22-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Conservation and Natural Resources
On February 1, 1997 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On January 30, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On January 29, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On January 20, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed 971366666
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
February 7, 1997: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
February 5, 1997: Reported from Cons. & Nat. Res. w/amd. (22-Y 0-N)
January 30, 1997: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
January 29, 1997: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor