+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On January 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ337ER)
On January 26, 2007 in the House:
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
On January 19, 2007 in the House:
- Laid on Speaker's table
- Received
On January 18, 2007 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Engrossed by Senate
On January 17, 2007 in the Senate:
- Introduced bill reprinted 075049726
On January 5, 2007 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and laid on Clerk's desk; offered 01/10/07 075049726
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor