+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ335ER)
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- Taken up
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (13-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned Rules sub: #3 Studies
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Placed on Calendar
On February 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On February 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SJ335S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 11104661D-S1
On January 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (38-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 11104661D-S1
- Reported from Rules with substitute by voice vote
On January 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned Rules sub: #1
On January 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102302D
+ − Votes (4)
February 22, 2011: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2011: Reported from Rules (13-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2011: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2011: Reading waived (38-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor